Hunting

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004 / CH0462
    (SB0046 / CH0463)
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, and Disabled VeteransDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 462Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0068 / CH0461Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart RecipientsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0126 / CH0102Natural Resources - Wildlife and HuntingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0187 / CH0290
    (SB0103 / CH0291)
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of ProvisionsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0305 / CH0304
    (SB0628)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0310 / CH0459Montgomery County - Deer Hunting - Sundays MC 21-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0312 / CH0458
    (SB0629)
Kent County - Deer Hunting - SundaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 458Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0313 / CH0443Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 10-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0368Hunting and Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Seniors, Veterans, and Military Personnel (Howard's Law)Delegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0655
    (SB0519 / CH0494)
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsFrederick County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0788 / CH0460
    (SB0844)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management PermitsEastern Shore DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0894Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - SundaysWicomico County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1111
    (SB0953)
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms SeasonDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1203
    (SB0954)
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of RiflesDelegate MautzIn the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Stein)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1246 / CH0746Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - HuntingDelegate ClarkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 746Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1361Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Hunting ExemptionsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1427 / CH0403Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - EstablishmentDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1629
    (SB1141)
Natural Resources - Hunting Licenses - Fox Hunting and ChasingDelegate BeitzelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0046 / CH0463
    (HB0004 / CH0462)
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled VeteransSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0066 / CH0402Hunter Safety Courses - Application of Requirement and Establishment of Incentives ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 402Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0103 / CH0291
    (HB0187 / CH0290)
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of ProvisionsSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0181Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural ResourcesSenator SimonaireIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0519 / CH0494
    (HB0655)
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0628
    (HB0305 / CH0304)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0629
    (HB0312 / CH0458)
Kent County - Deer Hunting - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0953
    (HB1111)
Natural Resources - Deer Management Region B - Deer Firearms SeasonSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0954
    (HB1203)
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of RiflesSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1141
    (HB1629)
Natural Resources - Hunting Licenses - Fox Hunting and ChasingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing canceledEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:39 A.M.