Indigent Persons

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0153Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalDelegate AndersonIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0606
    (SB0733)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of RenewalDelegate GriffithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0823 / CH0545
    (SB0764 / CH0544)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless YouthDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsChildren (O4)
HB1164
    (SB0773)
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing ExpansionDelegate ConwayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
SB0733
    (HB0606)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of RenewalSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0764 / CH0544
    (HB0823 / CH0545)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless YouthSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0773
    (HB1164)
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing ExpansionSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.