Indigent Persons

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0297
    (SB0225 / CH0333)
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Tuition Exemption - ModificationDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0361Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceDelegate VallarioIn the House - First Reading JudiciaryJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0391Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for ServicesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0439
    (SB0685 / CH0046)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0444Homeless Expenditures Accountability ActDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0465
    (SB0491)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0496
    (SB0942)
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0755 / CH0136
    (SB0695 / CH0135)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0852 / CH0460Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Best Practices and ModelsDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0900
    (SB0492)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0924
    (SB0272)
Requirements for Filial Support - RepealDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1119
    (SB0646)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1154Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Multifamily Low-Income Housing ProjectDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0225 / CH0333
    (HB0297)
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Tuition Exemption - ModificationSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0272
    (HB0924)
Requirements for Filial Support - RepealSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0491
    (HB0465)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0492
    (HB0900)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0646
    (HB1119)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0685 / CH0046
    (HB0439)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0695 / CH0135
    (HB0755 / CH0136)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0735Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility - RequirementsSenator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0942
    (HB0496)
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.