Indigent Persons

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0094
    (SB0147)
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training CenterDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0236 / CH0776Prince George's County - Affordable Housing Commission PG 408-18Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 776Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0431 / CH0379
    (SB0308 / CH0380)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0462Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - ReportsDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0612
    (SB0272)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence ProjectCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0781 / CH0388
    (SB0842 / CH0389)
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by ExaminationDelegate MosbyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0955 / CH0105Department of Housing and Community Development - Crisis Shelter Home Program for the HomelessDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1224
    (SB1218 / CH0748)
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018Delegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1667Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit ChargesDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1768Hospitals - Discharge of Patients - ProceduresDelegate HayesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1789Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Loving Arms Homeless Youth FacilityDelegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1797Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent HousingDelegate GlennIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsSocial Services - Generally (O1)
SB0025Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Light House Homeless Prevention Support CenterSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0147
    (HB0094)
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training CenterSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0272
    (HB0612)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Carroll County Veterans Independence ProjectSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0284 / CH0621Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0308 / CH0380
    (HB0431 / CH0379)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0466
    (HB0556 / CH0233)
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of FeesSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0842 / CH0389
    (HB0781 / CH0388)
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by ExaminationSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0912 / CH0559
    (HB1685 / CH0558)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Senator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0975Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic DiseaseSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1218 / CH0748
    (HB1224)
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018Senator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 748Finance
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.