Industry and Technology

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0227 / CH0002
    (SB0278 / CH0001)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0328 / CH0076
    (SB0779 / CH0075)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - DefinitionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0386 / CH0109
    (SB0203)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business RefundDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0551 / CH0489
    (SB0506 / CH0488)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0726
    (SB0384)
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research ProgramDelegate Turner, V.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0751Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0779
    (SB0368)
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency RequirementsDelegate TarrantIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0803 / CH0390Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax CreditChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0947Environment - Lead-Based Paint Damages - Manufacturers of Lead PigmentDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0948
    (SB0708)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1039
    (SB0883)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital ImprovementsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1045
    (SB0602)
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Best Available Technology RequirementDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1139
    (SB0886)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1206Strategic Industry Partnership - Income Tax CreditDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1315 / CH0150Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking (Maryland Jobs Development Act)Delegate ClagettApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0090 / CH0180
    (HB0548)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement FundSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0203
    (HB0386 / CH0109)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business RefundSenator KingIn the House - Rereferred to Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0278 / CH0001
    (HB0227 / CH0002)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0368
    (HB0779)
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency RequirementsSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0384
    (HB0726)
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research ProgramSenator PughIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0506 / CH0488
    (HB0551 / CH0489)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0602
    (HB1045)
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Best Available Technology RequirementSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0708
    (HB0948)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government OperationsFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0779 / CH0075
    (HB0328 / CH0076)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - DefinitionSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0883
    (HB1039)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Baltimore Museum of Industry Capital ImprovementsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0886
    (HB1139)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersSenator StoneIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.