Information Technology, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0601 / CH0673
    (SB0248)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1021 / CH0590Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1140
    (SB0439)
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1525
    (SB1025)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National StandardsDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0248
    (HB0601 / CH0673)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0286Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - RequirementSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0439
    (HB1140)
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1025
    (HB1525)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National StandardsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:35 A.M.