Insurance Administration

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0514 / CH0429
    (SB0258)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0552 / CH0494
    (SB0703)
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small EmployersDelegate PendergrassEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0630 / CH0444Mechanical Repair Contracts - RequirementsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0684Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - DeductiblesDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0691Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - RequiredDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0700
    (SB0436)
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - ExemptionsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0732
    (SB0770 / CH0051)
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell InsuranceDelegate VaughnVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0770
    (SB0573 / CH0367)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0781
    (SB0241 / CH0023)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - RequiredDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0822
    (SB0006)
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0859 / CH0108
    (SB0437)
Nonprofit Health Service Plans - Hearing and Order - Impact of Law or Regulatory Action by Another StateDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0990
    (SB0834)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1010
    (SB0586)
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on ComplianceDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0006
    (HB0822)
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0241 / CH0023
    (HB0781)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - RequiredSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 23Finance
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0258
    (HB0514 / CH0429)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0436
    (HB0700)
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - ExemptionsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0437
    (HB0859 / CH0108)
Nonprofit Health Service Plans - Hearing and Order - Impact of Law or Regulatory Action by Another StateSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0465 / CH0036
    (HB0468)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance CompanySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0556 / CH0363Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0573 / CH0367
    (HB0770)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0586
    (HB1010)
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on ComplianceSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0703
    (HB0552 / CH0494)
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small EmployersSenator MiddletonIn the House - Rereferred to Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0770 / CH0051
    (HB0732)
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell InsuranceSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0834
    (HB0990)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0868 / CH0204
    (HB1231)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire TransportationSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.