Insurance Administration

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0430
    (SB0168 / CH0431)
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and ProceduresDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0135 / CH0064
    (SB0137 / CH0065)
Health Insurance – Coverage for Male Sterilization – High–Deductible Health PlansDelegate HillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0189Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - RepealDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0946 / CH0508Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon LapseDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Health and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0979 / CH0197Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - RegulationDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1127 / CH0193
    (SB0876 / CH0194)
Insurance – Commercial Lines – Exemptions From FilingsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1131
    (SB1016)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating UnitsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1197
    (SB0706)
Telehealth - Coverage for Breast Cancer ServicesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1310 / CH0247
    (SB1101)
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing PracticesDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Health and Government Operations
3/12/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1312
    (SB0878)
Health Insurance - Medicaid Buy-In Task ForceDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1349 / CH0451
    (SB1079)
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - RevisionsDelegate AndertonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1400 / CH0307State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying OrganizationsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 307Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1514Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Low-Cost Automobile Insurance ProgramDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1782 / CH0037Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Delegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Health and Government Operations
3/12/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1795 / CH0006Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0075Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0078 / CH0667Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 667Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0137 / CH0065
    (HB0135 / CH0064)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health PlansSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0168 / CH0431
    (HB0027 / CH0430)
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and ProceduresSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0387 / CH0038Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Senator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0575
    (HB1499 / CH0533)
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud ReportingSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0652 / CH0198Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - RegulationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0706
    (HB1197)
Telehealth – Coverage for Breast Cancer ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0743 / CH0852
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0876 / CH0194
    (HB1127 / CH0193)
Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From FilingsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0878
    (HB1312)
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission – Medicaid Buy–In StudySenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1016
    (HB1131)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying OrganizationsSenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1079
    (HB1349 / CH0451)
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - RevisionsSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1101
    (HB1310 / CH0247)
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Procedures and Credentialing PracticesSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1205Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority to Adopt Regulations - Pharmacy Benefits ManagersSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
SB1267 / CH0007Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.