Interest

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0076
    (SB0102 / CH0010)
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former MembersDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0077
    (SB0103 / CH0150)
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and ReemploymentDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0148Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0240
    (SB0389)
State Individual Income Tax - Rate ChangesDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0511 / CH0428Real Property - Residential Property - Ground LeasesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0538
    (SB0075)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0594Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0677Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Independent Review Board - Refunds MC/PG 106-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0768Tax Procedure - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0770
    (SB0573 / CH0367)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0782 / CH0455
    (SB0408)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0840Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency JudgmentDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0953
    (SB0372)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0960Retire in Maryland Act of 2015Delegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0991Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1051
    (SB0424)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1193
    (SB0228)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1195
    (SB0877)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Delegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1233
    (SB0763 / CH0050)
Tax Amnesty ProgramDelegate WalkerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0075
    (HB0538)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0102 / CH0010
    (HB0076)
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former MembersSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0103 / CH0150
    (HB0077)
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and ReemploymentSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Budget and Taxation
2/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0228
    (HB1193)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0372
    (HB0953)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0389
    (HB0240)
State Individual Income Tax - Rate ChangesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0408
    (HB0782 / CH0455)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0424
    (HB1051)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0425Labor and Employment - Wage Disclosure and Discussion ProtectionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0432 / CH0032Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Combination of Service - ClarificationSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0467
    (HB0005 / CH0056)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Newborn Screening Program Fund - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0573 / CH0367
    (HB0770)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0623Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled HomeownersSenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0751Washington County - Board of Education - Financing AuthorityWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0763 / CH0050
    (HB1233)
Tax Amnesty ProgramSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0877
    (HB1195)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Senator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0896 / CH0390Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program and FundSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0924County Boards of Education - Private Financing AuthoritySenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.