Interest

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0104Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - LiensChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0112 / CH0506Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - RoundingDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 506Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0161Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RestructuringChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0196Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Interest Paid on Student LoansDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0202 / CH0268
    (SB0255 / CH0267)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0320Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0399
    (SB0320)
Student Debt Relief Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0442Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation TrustDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0485
    (SB1177 / CH0497)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of ProfitDelegate ImpallariaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0568Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a SetoffDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0639
    (SB0833)
Corporate Income Tax - Throwback RuleDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0729 / CH0091
    (SB0819 / CH0090)
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and DutiesDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0742Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery LicensesDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0915
    (SB0605)
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional TaxDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1044
    (SB0992)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1064
    (SB0478)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1104 / CH0503
    (SB0276)
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic PartnershipDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1270 / CH0724
    (SB0527 / CH0723)
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and ChargesDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 724Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1439
    (SB0473 / CH0080)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1517
    (SB0465 / CH0629)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansDelegate GlennVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1631
    (SB1026)
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure StatementsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0260Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator BatesIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0276
    (HB1104 / CH0503)
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic PartnershipSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0320
    (HB0399)
Student Debt Relief Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0473 / CH0080
    (HB1439)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0478
    (HB1064)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0527 / CH0723
    (HB1270 / CH0724)
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and ChargesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 723Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0605
    (HB0915)
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional TaxSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0819 / CH0090
    (HB0729 / CH0091)
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and DutiesSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0833
    (HB0639)
Corporate Income Tax - Throwback RuleSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0973
    (HB1073)
Maryland Technology Development CorporationSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0992
    (HB1044)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1026
    (HB1631)
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure StatementsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB1177 / CH0497
    (HB0485)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of ProfitSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:50 A.M.