Interest

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0408 / CH0539Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0475Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Accrual of Property Tax, Interest, and PenaltiesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0660Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits for State Residents (HealthcareMaryland)Delegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0971Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement AllowanceDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB1019
    (SB0699 / CH0509)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member ContributionsDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1051Corporate Income Tax - Throwback RuleDelegate Young, P.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1096 / CH0786State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success ProgramDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 786Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1102 / CH0115Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise FundCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1297 / CH0790Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 790Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1321 / CH0099
    (SB0889)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsDelegate CordermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1336Income Tax - Calculation of Maryland Taxable Income - Itemized DeductionsDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1354 / CH0117Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1465 / CH0058Tax Sales - Homeowner ProtectionsDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1499 / CH0533
    (SB0575)
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud ReportingDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Economic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1560Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and ReportDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1647Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1685 / CH0558
    (SB0912 / CH0559)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Delegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1804 / CH0590Health – Medical Research FundingDelegate BuschApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0017 / CH0657Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and RegulationsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 657Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0065Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0067Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RevisingChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0193Income Tax - Interest Rate - Wynne CaseSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0428Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator BatesIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0538Corporate Income Tax - Throwback RuleSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0565Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsSenator SerafiniIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0575
    (HB1499 / CH0533)
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud ReportingSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0606 / CH0700Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail FundSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 700Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0611 / CH0561Education – Healthy School Facility Fund – EstablishedSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0699 / CH0509
    (HB1019)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection – Former Members – Member ContributionsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0889
    (HB1321 / CH0099)
Washington County – Public Facilities BondsWashington County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1243
    (HB1783 / CH0014)
21st Century School Facilities ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 2:00 P.M.