International Affairs

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0191 / CH0438
    (SB0047 / CH0437)
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured GoodsDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0431 / CH0115Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0534
    (SB0438)
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United StatesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0624 / CH0282
    (SB0501 / CH0281)
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical ExperienceDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0877 / CH0555
    (SB0811 / CH0554)
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt RegulationsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0973
    (SB0723)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery MuseumDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HJ0002Ongoing Conflict in the Democratic Republic of the CongoDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0047 / CH0437
    (HB0191 / CH0438)
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured GoodsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0056 / CH0010Unauthorized Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Transcripts, Diplomas, and Grade Reports - PenaltiesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0438
    (HB0534)
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United StatesSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0501 / CH0281
    (HB0624 / CH0282)
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical ExperienceSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0723
    (HB0973)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kids International Discovery MuseumSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0811 / CH0554
    (HB0877 / CH0555)
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt RegulationsSenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SJ0001International Education - SupportSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SJ0004Support of the Efforts of the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic to Develop as a Free and Independent NationSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.