International Affairs

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0465State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - AuthorizedChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0760Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations LawsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0909Procurement - Purchasing Products Containing Chicken Processed in China - Prohibition on Use of State FundsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0938Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice RequirementsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0998
    (SB0647)
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - ProhibitionDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1272Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HJ0011Commemoration of World Autism Awareness DayDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0647
    (HB0998)
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB1000Historically Black Colleges and Universities - International EducationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Higher Education (F2)
SJ0002Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War IISenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.