Interstate Affairs

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003 / CH0627
    (SB0138)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0229Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility IncentivesDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0452 / CH0291
    (SB0389 / CH0292)
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - RepealDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0477Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0739Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Application Fee ExemptionDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0842
    (SB0227)
Small Business Fairness Act of 2018Delegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0937Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - RegistrationDelegate FlanaganIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsEconomic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1211Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Modification of OrdersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1522Handgun Permits - Universal RecognitionDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1659
    (SB0789)
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - PurchasesDelegate OttoIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1794 / CH0342Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor ApportionmentDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0138
    (HB0003 / CH0627)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0227
    (HB0842)
Small Business Fairness Act of 2018Senator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0389 / CH0292
    (HB0452 / CH0291)
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationAgriculture (M4)
SB0789
    (HB1659)
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – PurchasesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1025Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State VendorsSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB1090 / CH0341Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor ApportionmentSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.