Judges

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0043Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0046Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0073 / CH0796Election Law - Election Judges - Minimum AgeDelegate LuedtkeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0087
    (SB0156)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0377
    (SB0940)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Gaming (C7)
HB0484
    (SB0861)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0532
    (SB1133)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0579Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0628 / CH0613
    (SB0517 / CH0614)
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within DepartmentsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0629 / CH0079
    (SB0211 / CH0078)
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense AllowanceCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0724Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0826Circuit Court Judges - Selection and TenureDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1157
    (SB0879)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1160Baltimore County - Judges - Nonpartisan Elections (Baltimore County Voting Rights Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Elections (G1)
HB1163 / CH0643
    (SB0976)
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Delegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1208
    (SB0616)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1240 / CH0715Individualized Education Programs - StudiesDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 715Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1344
    (SB0182 / CH0010)
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - EligibilityDelegate Wilson, C.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1382 / CH0439
    (SB1121 / CH0440)
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary ElectionDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Judicial ProceedingsElections (G1)
HB1390
    (SB0880)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - ReformDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0156
    (HB0087)
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - ProceduresSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0182 / CH0010
    (HB1344)
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - EligibilitySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0211 / CH0078
    (HB0629 / CH0079)
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense AllowanceCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0509 / CH0454Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalarySenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0517 / CH0614
    (HB0628 / CH0613)
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within DepartmentsSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0616
    (HB1208)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0744Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0861
    (HB0484)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsSenator SmithIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0879
    (HB1157)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0880
    (HB1390)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - ReformSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0933Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - PresentmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0940
    (HB0377)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Gaming (C7)
SB0976
    (HB1163 / CH0643)
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Senator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1133
    (HB0532)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentitySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.