Judgments

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0733Courts - Civil Court Records - ShieldingDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB1112
    (SB0951 / CH0568)
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned PropertyDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1267
    (SB0869)
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1409Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)Delegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1456 / CH0626
    (SB1128)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1611Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1649Public Safety – Police Misconduct and Civil Rights Actions – Settlement DatabaseDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0572Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesSenator BensonVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0869
    (HB1267)
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human TraffickingSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0951 / CH0568
    (HB1112)
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned PropertySenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB1128
    (HB1456 / CH0626)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1210Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act)Senator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.