Judicial Review

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0034Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of LimitationsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0070Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Elections (G1)
HB0083 / CH0585
    (SB0240)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0384
    (SB0290 / CH0480)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0402 / CH0399
    (SB0314 / CH0153)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Health and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0418
    (SB0691)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0658 / CH0102Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government - Study on Appeals Under the Maryland Public Information ActDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0908 / CH0560
    (SB0849 / CH0559)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesDelegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0912 / CH0242
    (SB0924)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacyDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1009
    (SB0789)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1211State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and RegulationDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1218 / CH0565
    (SB0854 / CH0564)
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy InternsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1269Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1337
    (SB0798)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1453 / CH0481
    (SB1062)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0054 / CH0120Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training CouncilChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0169Maryland Higher Education Commission - Review of Duplicative Academic Program Proposals - RevisionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0240
    (HB0083 / CH0585)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0290 / CH0480
    (HB0384)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0314 / CH0153
    (HB0402 / CH0399)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0461Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0691
    (HB0418)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0789
    (HB1009)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0798
    (HB1337)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0849 / CH0559
    (HB0908 / CH0560)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0854 / CH0564
    (HB1218 / CH0565)
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy InternsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0924
    (HB0912 / CH0242)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacySenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1016Maryland Kinesiology ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1062
    (HB1453 / CH0481)
Education - Baltimore County School Board Nominating CommissionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.