Judicial Review

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0243
    (SB0166)
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial ReviewDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0377
    (SB0513)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0419
    (SB0822)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0605 / CH0443
    (SB0859 / CH0442)
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative AppealsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0645
    (SB1021)
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial ReviewDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0683
    (SB0448)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0869
    (SB0574)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0878 / CH0162
    (SB0128 / CH0161)
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to OperateDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0918
    (SB0957)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear ViolationsDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1027Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Generally (L1)
HB1175
    (SB0664)
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits ActDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1228
    (SB0832)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1240
    (SB0812)
Sediment Control - Violations - EnforcementDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1248
    (SB0428)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1495
    (SB0942 / CH0704)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial ReviewDelegate CullisonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0128 / CH0161
    (HB0878 / CH0162)
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to OperateSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 161Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0166
    (HB0243)
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial ReviewSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0428
    (HB1248)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0446Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0448
    (HB0683)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0513
    (HB0377)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0574
    (HB0869)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0656Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0664
    (HB1175)
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0812
    (HB1240)
Sediment Control - Violations - EnforcementSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0822
    (HB0419)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0832
    (HB1228)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0859 / CH0442
    (HB0605 / CH0443)
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative AppealsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 442Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0942 / CH0704
    (HB1495)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial ReviewSenator RamirezEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0957
    (HB0918)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear ViolationsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1021
    (HB0645)
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial ReviewSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.