Judicial Review

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070
    (SB0151)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0279
    (SB0272 / CH0655)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0497
    (SB0760)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0628 / CH0613
    (SB0517 / CH0614)
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within DepartmentsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0810 / CH0257Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0151
    (HB0070)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0164Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning ApplicationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0225Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0272 / CH0655
    (HB0279)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0760
    (HB0497)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineSenator GuzzoneIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0832Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.