Judicial Review

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0966
    (SB1103)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1219Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood BlightDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1560Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and ReportDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1758
    (SB0639 / CH0013)
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing ProceduresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0374Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0639 / CH0013
    (HB1758)
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing ProceduresSenator GuzzoneGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1103
    (HB0966)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:22 P.M.