Juries

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0439
    (SB0538)
Courts - Jury Service - ExcusalDelegate SummersIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0995Firearms Freedom ActDelegate DwyerIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1200 / CH0202
    (SB0752)
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
SB0538
    (HB0439)
Courts - Jury Service - ExcusalSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0720Courts - Prosecution for Sex Offense - Evidence of Prior ActSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0752
    (HB1200 / CH0202)
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
SB0860 / CH0201Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - ProceduresSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 201Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1090Prince George's County - Circuit Court - Attorney Appearance FeePrince George's County SenatorsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.