Jurisdiction

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers Scores for Maryland Public School StudentsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0071
    (SB0210 / CH0467)
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food ServiceDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0165 / CH0553
    (SB0137 / CH0554)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0252 / CH0315Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and WineDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0279
    (SB0272 / CH0655)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0371
    (SB0312)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)SpeakerIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0385
    (SB0252)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0604
    (SB0802)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health CareDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0628 / CH0613
    (SB0517 / CH0614)
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within DepartmentsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0693
    (SB0642)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - RevisionsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0722
    (SB0881)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0955Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of CourtDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1172
    (SB0400)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing canceledHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1191
    (SB0378)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1368Electricians - Local Licenses - RepealDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1504Baltimore City - Control of Baltimore City Police DepartmentDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HJ0007United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0137 / CH0554
    (HB0165 / CH0553)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0252
    (HB0385)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0272 / CH0655
    (HB0279)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0312
    (HB0371)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders and Punitive Damages (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)PresidentIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0378
    (HB1191)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0400
    (HB1172)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0517 / CH0614
    (HB0628 / CH0613)
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within DepartmentsSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0642
    (HB0693)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - RevisionsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0802
    (HB0604)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health CareSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0864Education - Overdose on Public School Premises - Substance Abuse Treatment ProgramsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
SB0881
    (HB0722)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB1172Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Breweries - Barrelage and Hours of SaleSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SJ0003United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.