Juvenile Causes

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0245 / CH0090Family Law - Substance-Exposed NewbornsChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0246Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video ConferencingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0264 / CH0611Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - DisclosureChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0277
    (SB0264 / CH0036)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0278
    (SB0265 / CH0037)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0282
    (SB0229)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0588
    (SB0473 / CH0474)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0604 / CH0497
    (SB0536 / CH0496)
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - ReportDelegate HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0711
    (SB0732)
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued DetentionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0738Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - False Statements About Destructive Devices or Toxic MaterialsAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0786 / CH0639Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court JurisdictionDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0829Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint RestrictionsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0848
    (SB0454)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0916 / CH0651
    (SB0791)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0966
    (SB0788)
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion PracticesDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1320 / CH0413Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - ExtensionDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1338 / CH0677Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 306-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 677Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1377
    (SB0956)
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory BoardDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB1382Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Delegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1460
    (SB1010)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesDelegate RudolphIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
SB0086 / CH0022Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of AssistanceChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0229
    (HB0282)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0264 / CH0036
    (HB0277)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0265 / CH0037
    (HB0278)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0454
    (HB0848)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0473 / CH0474
    (HB0588)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0536 / CH0496
    (HB0604 / CH0497)
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - ReportSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0648Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and DetentionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0678Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0732
    (HB0711)
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued DetentionSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0788
    (HB0966)
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion PracticesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0791
    (HB0916 / CH0651)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceSenator KelleyIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0818Community Juvenile Services ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0831State Budget - Evidence-Based Policy OptionsSenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0956
    (HB1377)
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory BoardSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB1010
    (HB1460)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.