Juvenile Causes

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0279
    (SB0272 / CH0655)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0401
    (SB0196)
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - ImpositionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0416
    (SB0442)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0471
    (SB0215)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0853Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum AgeDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0893
    (SB0583)
Juvenile Law - ProbationDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0928
    (SB0907)
Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video ConferenceDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1219 / CH0157
    (SB0912 / CH0156)
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex TraffickingChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1256
    (SB0982 / CH0487)
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - ReportDelegate JalisiIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-21)Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1569Prince George's County - Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision Program - Study PG 304-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0005Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum AgeChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0035 / CH0194Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health ProgramChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0043 / CH0193Juvenile Court Records - DisclosureChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0196
    (HB0401)
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - ImpositionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0215
    (HB0471)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0272 / CH0655
    (HB0279)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0442
    (HB0416)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0583
    (HB0893)
Juvenile Law - ProbationSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0864Education - Overdose on Public School Premises - Substance Abuse Treatment ProgramsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
SB0904Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum AgeSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0907
    (HB0928)
Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video ConferenceSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0912 / CH0156
    (HB1219 / CH0157)
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex TraffickingChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0981
    (HB1255)
Juveniles - Mechanical RestraintsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0982 / CH0487
    (HB1256)
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - ReportSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.