Juvenile Facilities

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0246Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video ConferencingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0433
    (SB0412)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0679Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice RequirementDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0711
    (SB0732)
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued DetentionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0786 / CH0639Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court JurisdictionDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0848
    (SB0454)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1115 / CH0404
    (SB0593)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilityDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1201Baltimore City - New Youth Detention Facility - Commission on Delinquency and Youth Detention PreventionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1307
    (SB0939)
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - NoticeDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0395Juvenile Services - State-Licensed Facilities - Size Limit Exception - RepealSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0412
    (HB0433)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0454
    (HB0848)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0593
    (HB1115 / CH0404)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilitySenator MontgomeryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0648Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and DetentionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0678Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0732
    (HB0711)
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued DetentionSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0939
    (HB1307)
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice RequirementSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.