Juvenile Facilities

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0618 / CH0442
    (SB0172)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 442Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0671Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0856
    (SB0571)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0955Child Protection - Reporting Requirements - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0172
    (HB0618 / CH0442)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator GladdenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0571
    (HB0856)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.