Juvenile Facilities

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0196Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0304
    (SB0243)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0757Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree MurderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1463
    (SB0317 / CH0063)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipDelegate PattersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1634 / CH0655
    (SB1072)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemDelegate JalisiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0081Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination DateChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0189Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - LimitationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0243
    (HB0304)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0317 / CH0063
    (HB1463)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0325Juvenile Services Education - ModificationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB1072
    (HB1634 / CH0655)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.