Juvenile Services, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0264 / CH0611Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - DisclosureChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0544
    (SB0491)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0588
    (SB0473 / CH0474)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0604 / CH0497
    (SB0536 / CH0496)
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - ReportDelegate HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0679Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice RequirementDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0829Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint RestrictionsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0916 / CH0651
    (SB0791)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1125
    (SB0388)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1307
    (SB0939)
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - NoticeDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1320 / CH0413Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - ExtensionDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1338 / CH0677Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 306-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 677Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1377
    (SB0956)
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory BoardDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
SB0388
    (HB1125)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0395Juvenile Services - State-Licensed Facilities - Size Limit Exception - RepealSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0442Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of UnderstandingSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0473 / CH0474
    (HB0588)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0491
    (HB0544)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0536 / CH0496
    (HB0604 / CH0497)
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - ReportSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0678Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0791
    (HB0916 / CH0651)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceSenator KelleyIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0897 / CH0329
    (HB1297 / CH0330)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0939
    (HB1307)
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice RequirementSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0956
    (HB1377)
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory BoardSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.