Juvenile Services, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0751 / CH0629Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Court-Ordered Services ProviderDelegate SanchezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0811Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human TraffickingDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0855 / CH0555
    (SB0439 / CH0554)
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and ReinstatementDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1463
    (SB0317 / CH0063)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipDelegate PattersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1634 / CH0655
    (SB1072)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemDelegate JalisiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0081Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination DateChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0189Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - LimitationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0317 / CH0063
    (HB1463)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0325Juvenile Services Education - ModificationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0439 / CH0554
    (HB0855 / CH0555)
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and ReinstatementSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1072
    (HB1634 / CH0655)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.