Kent County

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0226
    (SB0049 / CH0266)
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Delegate JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0242
    (SB0282 / CH0152)
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent CountyDelegate JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0855
    (SB0038)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB1034
    (SB0901 / CH0358)
Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of OperationQueen Anne's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1135
    (SB0899 / CH0573)
Kent County - Gaming - PermitsDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0031Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0038
    (HB0855)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB0049 / CH0266
    (HB0226)
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Senator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0282 / CH0152
    (HB0242)
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent CountySenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0899 / CH0573
    (HB1135)
Kent County - Gaming - PermitsSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0901 / CH0358
    (HB1034)
Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of OperationSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 358Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.