Kent County

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0204Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0302 / CH0125
    (SB0389 / CH0126)
Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce ZonesDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0305 / CH0304
    (SB0628)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0312 / CH0458
    (SB0629)
Kent County - Deer Hunting - SundaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 458Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0478
    (SB0555)
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp FairleeDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0684 / CH0006
    (SB1024 / CH0607)
Education - State Grants for Education AidDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1111
    (SB0953)
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms SeasonDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1597
    (SB0551)
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Echo Hill Outdoor SchoolDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0389 / CH0126
    (HB0302 / CH0125)
Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce ZonesSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0551
    (HB1597)
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Echo Hill Outdoor SchoolSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0555
    (HB0478)
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp FairleeSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0628
    (HB0305 / CH0304)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0629
    (HB0312 / CH0458)
Kent County - Deer Hunting - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1024 / CH0607
    (HB0684 / CH0006)
Education - State Grants for Education AidSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.