Labeling

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0133 / CH0447
    (SB0150 / CH0446)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0275 / CH0461
    (SB0349 / CH0460)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Wicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0455 / CH0117Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0482Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - LabelingDelegate VitaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0649 / CH0130Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0749 / CH0387
    (SB0767)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0768Food Service Facilities - Industrially Produced Trans Fat - ProhibitionDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0773Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - TaxDelegate BurnsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Public Safety (E4)
HB0903Genetically Engineered Food - Disclosure and Labeling RequirementsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1086
    (SB0576)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1415Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and EquipmentDelegate MyersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0150 / CH0446
    (HB0133 / CH0447)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0349 / CH0460
    (HB0275 / CH0461)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Senator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0392 / CH0253Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0521Agriculture - Meat and Poultry - Antibiotic Use - LabelingSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0576
    (HB1086)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0767
    (HB0749 / CH0387)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0781Pharmacists - Biosimilar Biological Products - SubstitutionsSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0955 / CH0589Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's LicenseSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.