Labeling

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0061Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine ContainersDelegate VitaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0208 / CH0518
    (SB0546 / CH0517)
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and LabelsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0210
    (SB0561)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0301
    (SB0413 / CH0496)
Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0303 / CH0593
    (SB0412)
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0421Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitsDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0880
    (SB0658)
Marijuana Control Act of 2014Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0913Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0990Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1079 / CH0487Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1191
    (SB0778)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0070 / CH0011Agriculture - Fertilizer - Labeling and Restrictions on Use and SaleChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0341 / CH0486Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0394Statewide Container Recycling Refund ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0412
    (HB0303 / CH0593)
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActSenator DysonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0413 / CH0496
    (HB0301)
Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0546 / CH0517
    (HB0208 / CH0518)
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and LabelsSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0561
    (HB0210)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCarroll County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0658
    (HB0880)
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0778
    (HB1191)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0856Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1092Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw MilkSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.Rules Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.