Labeling

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0088 / CH0061Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers MC 19-15Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0108
    (SB0037)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0475Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container PermitsHarford County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0605
    (SB0163)
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0638Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational HarvestDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0693Public Health - Cottage Food Businesses - RevisionsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - First Reading Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB0756 / CH0273Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's CountyDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0760
    (SB0557)
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0835 / CH0105
    (SB0633)
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container PermitWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0945
    (SB0626 / CH0044)
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and DevicesDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0982
    (SB0684)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1075
    (SB0470)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationAgriculture (M4)
HB1095
    (SB0504)
Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and MarketingDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1208
    (SB0278)
Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food TransparencyDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1231
    (SB0868 / CH0204)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network ServicesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 a.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0037
    (HB0108)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0163
    (HB0605)
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)Senator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0278
    (HB1208)
Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food TransparencySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Second Reading FailedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0299 / CH0158Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container PermitsHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0354Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's CountySenator HersheyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0470
    (HB1075)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0504
    (HB1095)
Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and MarketingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0557
    (HB0760)
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)Senator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0626 / CH0044
    (HB0945)
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and DevicesSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0633
    (HB0835 / CH0105)
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container PermitWashington County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0684
    (HB0982)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0748Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild VenisonSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0868 / CH0204
    (HB1231)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire TransportationSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.