Laboratories

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0312 / CH0457
    (SB0334 / CH0456)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0389Lead Safe Income Tax CreditDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1254
    (SB0242)
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - RegulationDelegate CostaIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
SB0114Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B TestingSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0207Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0242
    (HB1254)
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - RegulationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0334 / CH0456
    (HB0312 / CH0457)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.