Laboratories

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0490 / CH0251Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous RevisionsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0665
    (SB0675)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety ProgramDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0952Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and FundDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1122
    (SB0792 / CH0383)
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ TransplantationDelegate HillIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1207Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - RegulationDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0205Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - PenaltiesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0675
    (HB0665)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety ProgramSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0792 / CH0383
    (HB1122)
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ TransplantationSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0810Higher Education - Programs in Dental Hygiene and Medical Laboratory Technology - Transfer of Students and Senatorial and Delegate ScholarshipsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.