Laboratories

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1003
    (SB0709)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - MdBioLab STEM Education EquipmentDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1022Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist OrdersDelegate WestIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1141
    (SB1094)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1172
    (SB0400)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing canceledHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1404Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices StudyDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1489Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0400
    (HB1172)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0709
    (HB1003)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - MdBioLab STEM Education EquipmentSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0999
    (HB1443)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1094
    (HB1141)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

April 10, 2017 2:47 P.M.