Labor and Industry, Division of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0098
    (SB0135)
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0180Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewDelegate SteinIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0512
    (SB0377)
Labor and Employment - Wage History InformationDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0540Labor and Employment - Pre-Tax Transportation Fringe Benefit - Requirement (Maryland Pre-Tax Commuter Benefit Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0541Labor and Employment – Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)Delegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0664
    (SB0543)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate HettlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1107 / CH0337
    (SB0831)
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship ProgramDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1243Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesDelegate MoralesIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1262Healthy Working Families Act - Enforcement - Modifications (Healthy Working Families Enforcement Consistency Act)Delegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1417Healthy Working Families Act - Delay of Effective DateDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1493
    (SB0526)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1496Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act)Delegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1637Labor and Employment - Parking Cash-Out Program - RequirementDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0135
    (HB0098)
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0235Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - IndexingSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0304Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective DateSenator MiddletonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0368Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - IncreaseSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0377
    (HB0512)
Labor and Employment - Pay Scales and Wage History InformationSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0526
    (HB1493)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0543
    (HB0664)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0572Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0831
    (HB1107 / CH0337)
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship ProgramSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB1019Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - IncreaseSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1224Procurement - Prevailing Wage - ModificationsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.