Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016
    (SB0261)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0227 / CH0002
    (SB0278 / CH0001)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0347 / CH0613Professional Engineers - Firm PermitsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0354 / CH0103Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for FraudChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0576
    (SB0794)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0583 / CH0121Unemployment Insurance - Relief from Charges for Overpayment of Benefits - RestrictionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Delegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0698 / CH0241
    (SB0356 / CH0240)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudyDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0774
    (SB0804)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0828 / CH0642
    (SB0766)
Business Occupations - Oil and Gas Land Professionals - RegistrationDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 642Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1086
    (SB0576)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1098 / CH0402
    (SB0290)
Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage LawDelegate OlszewskiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 402Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1206Strategic Industry Partnership - Income Tax CreditDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1331Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1386
    (SB0916 / CH0579)
Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for ElectriciansDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic MattersRulesBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1486Procurement - Occupational Safety and Health PrequalificationDelegate McHaleIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0261
    (HB0016)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0278 / CH0001
    (HB0227 / CH0002)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0356 / CH0240
    (HB0698 / CH0241)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudySenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240Finance
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0433Task Force to Study the Establishment of Educational Programs for Adult LearnersSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0528Business Regulation - Shark Fin Soup - Prohibition on Sale or ConsumptionSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0576
    (HB1086)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0766
    (HB0828 / CH0642)
Business Occupations - Oil and Gas Land Professionals - RegistrationSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0794
    (HB0576)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0804
    (HB0774)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0827
    (HB0660)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Senator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0916 / CH0579
    (HB1386)
Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for ElectriciansSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.