Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0085Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and RecordsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0166
    (SB0449)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0168 / CH0588Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Boards, Commissions, and Councils - Member RemovalDelegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0189 / CH0549
    (SB0711 / CH0548)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and AccessibilityDelegate SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0338Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required RecordsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0765 / CH0613State Personnel - Authority to Set CompensationChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0918
    (SB0382 / CH0161)
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required RecordsDelegate CostaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0951 / CH0625
    (SB0774)
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification RequirementsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0985Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for ServicesDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1018Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small BusinessesDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB1119
    (SB0877)
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1163Income Tax Credit - Hiring Qualified VeteransDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1293Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - RegistrationDelegate VaughnIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1338State Construction Projects - Work-Based Learning and Local HiringDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1417 / CH0251Unemployment Insurance - Work SharingChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Economic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB1524Task Force to Study Continuing Education and Firm Permits for Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors and PlumbersDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0054 / CH0120Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training CouncilChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0120 / CH0136Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent SurrogatesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0274Business Occupations - Common Ownership Community Managers - RegistrationSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0355Task Force to Study the Establishment of Specialized and Accelerated Educational Programs for Adult LearnersSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0382 / CH0161
    (HB0918)
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required RecordsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 161Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0449
    (HB0166)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0711 / CH0548
    (HB0189 / CH0549)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and AccessibilitySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0774
    (HB0951 / CH0625)
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.