Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0066Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0372Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential PropertyDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0391Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for ServicesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0551
    (SB0620)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0909
    (SB0582 / CH0315)
Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-OffendersDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0942 / CH0140
    (SB0772)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0985Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - EstablishmentDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1145
    (SB0903)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentDelegate FrushIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1253
    (SB0910 / CH0208)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - StudyDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0582 / CH0315
    (HB0909)
Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-OffendersSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0616Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0620
    (HB0551)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015Senator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0624Task Force to Study the Expansion of Career and Technical Education in MarylandSenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0772
    (HB0942 / CH0140)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0774
    (HB0940 / CH0138)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0903
    (HB1145)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0907Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction ProjectsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledFinance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0910 / CH0208
    (HB1253)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - StudySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.