Landlord and Tenant

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0045
    (SB0337)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0078
    (SB0160)
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable PresumptionDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0315Residential Leases - Rent Stabilization and Just Cause EvictionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0521
    (SB0366 / CH0462)
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground RentsDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0618Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0754Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified OfferDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0924Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Applicability and Registration RequirementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0944District Court - Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant CasesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0968Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to RepossessDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1067Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1090 / CH0327
    (SB0849 / CH0326)
Public Utilities - Consumer Relations - Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility BillsDelegate BarnesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 327Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1173Small Business Energy Assistance ActDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1222Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance ActionsDelegate WeirIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1279 / CH0410
    (SB0902)
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - EnforcementDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1299Lead Poisoning - Risk Reduction Standard - Frequency of TestingDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1308 / CH0515
    (SB0642 / CH0514)
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial EvictionsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1413 / CH0595
    (SB0969 / CH0594)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0160
    (HB0078)
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable PresumptionSenator FroshIn the House - Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0337
    (HB0045)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0366 / CH0462
    (HB0521)
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground RentsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 462Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0407Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of PaymentSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0625Real Property - Dwellings Rented to Individuals at Least 55 Years Old - Air-Conditioning SystemsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0642 / CH0514
    (HB1308 / CH0515)
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial EvictionsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 514Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0849 / CH0326
    (HB1090 / CH0327)
Public Utilities - Consumer Relations - Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility BillsSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 326Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0902
    (HB1279 / CH0410)
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - EnforcementSenator MuseIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental MattersPublic Safety (E4)
SB0969 / CH0594
    (HB1413 / CH0595)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1059Landlord and Tenant - Application Fees - Prospective Tenants Who Receive Housing AssistanceSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.