Landlord and Tenant

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0080Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0249 / CH0489
    (SB0345 / CH0488)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB0366Home Act of 2014Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Human Relations (D5)
HB0408
    (SB0268)
Real Property - Breach of Lease - Notice RequirementsDelegate Robinson, S.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB0422
    (SB0991)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0563Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0645Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance ActionsDelegate WeirIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0664Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking RestrictionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0683Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0843Residential Leases - Just Cause EvictionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0880
    (SB0658)
Marijuana Control Act of 2014Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0888Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Applicability and Registration RequirementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0946
    (SB0181)
Residential Leases - Just-Cause EvictionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0971Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Unpaid Assessments and Fees - Petition for ReliefDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1077Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1098Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1108
    (SB0800 / CH0556)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for Relief and Timing of Prohibited ActionsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1143
    (SB0799)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Types of Prohibited ActionsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1280Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Renter's Insurance Naming Landlord as BeneficiaryDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1321Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and RegistrationDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1471State Real Estate Commission - Registration of Residential Rental Property ManagersDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1480Electricity - Smart Meter Installation Charges - Residential Rental PropertyDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1481Electricity - Smart Meter Installation - Consent RequirementDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1529
    (SB1095)
Real Property - Ground RentsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0174Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of PaymentSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0181
    (HB0946)
Residential Leases - Just-Cause EvictionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0268
    (HB0408)
Real Property - Breach of Lease - Notice RequirementsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0345 / CH0488
    (HB0249 / CH0489)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0450Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0658
    (HB0880)
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0799
    (HB1143)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Types of Prohibited ActionsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0800 / CH0556
    (HB1108)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0904Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0991
    (HB0422)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedSenator KingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1095
    (HB1529)
Real Property - Ground RentsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.