Landlord and Tenant

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0045Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required RedemptionDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0327Real Property - Residential Leases - Notice of Routine MaintenanceDelegate MieleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0434
    (SB0062)
Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on RestrictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0500Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking RestrictionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0594Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition SignsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0640
    (SB0526)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Police OfficersDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0699
    (SB0301)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0851 / CH0704Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for RentDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 704Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0918Environment - Water Services - Water Affordability ProgramDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1173Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - RequirementsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB1185
    (SB0928)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1194Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for RentDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1487Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - ProceduresDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1550Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Commercial Property - Service of ProcessDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
HB1625
    (SB1195)
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0049 / CH0705Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for RentSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 705Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0062
    (HB0434)
Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on RestrictionsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0301
    (HB0699)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0408Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of ViolenceSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0526
    (HB0640)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Public Safety OfficersSenator FergusonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0706Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and AppealsSenator NormanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0928
    (HB1185)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1005Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent IncreasesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Real Property (N1)
SB1195
    (HB1625)
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:43 A.M.