Land Records

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0028Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center PropertyAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0044Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability CompanyDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0066 / CH0088Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - RepealChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
HB0508
    (SB0330)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0576 / CH0398
    (SB0525 / CH0399)
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - ClarificationDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0833 / CH0373
    (SB0306 / CH0372)
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - CalculationDelegate EbersoleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0920 / CH0396
    (SB0509 / CH0395)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1017 / CH0369
    (SB0256 / CH0368)
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1085Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1470Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Purchase of ResidenceDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0256 / CH0368
    (HB1017 / CH0369)
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled HomeownersSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0306 / CH0372
    (HB0833 / CH0373)
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - CalculationSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 372Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0330
    (HB0508)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0509 / CH0395
    (HB0920 / CH0396)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0525 / CH0399
    (HB0576 / CH0398)
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - ClarificationSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1047 / CH0602Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic ViolenceSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.