Land Records

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0280
    (SB0076)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of NameDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0320Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0404 / CH0425
    (SB0234)
St. Mary's County - Land Records - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1077Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - EnforcementDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1274Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0076
    (HB0280)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of NameSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0234
    (HB0404 / CH0425)
St. Mary's County - Land Records - RepealSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0803Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.