Language

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044
    (SB0314)
Special Education - IEP Translation Pilot Program - EstablishmentDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0166
    (SB0310)
Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - EstablishmentDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0452 / CH0421
    (SB0497)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsDelegate EbersoleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0528Labor and Employment - Wage Records, Wages, and Paydays - RequirementsDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0580 / CH0437
    (SB0198)
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended CoursesDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0790
    (SB0635 / CH0187)
Washington County - Board of Education - Alternative Teacher Certification ProgramWashington County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0954 / CH0134Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - ReportsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0978 / CH0112HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - ModificationDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0985Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - EstablishmentDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1006
    (SB0572)
Hospitals - Designation of CaregiversDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1198
    (SB0882 / CH0130)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1289 / CH0308
    (SB0941)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Judiciary
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0198
    (HB0580 / CH0437)
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended CoursesSenator Nathan-PulliamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0310
    (HB0166)
Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - EstablishmentSenator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0314
    (HB0044)
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native LanguageSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0497
    (HB0452 / CH0421)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0572
    (HB1006)
Hospitals - Designation of CaregiversSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0622 / CH0373Education - English Language Learner Liaison Pilot ProgramSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0635 / CH0187
    (HB0790)
State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - Alternative Teacher Certification ProgramWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 187Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0758State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Web SitesSenator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0882 / CH0130
    (HB1198)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0941
    (HB1289 / CH0308)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.