Language

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0184 / CH0768Public Health - Treatment of Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder - Identification and Posting of InformationDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 768Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0482 / CH0515
    (SB0385 / CH0516)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0808
    (SB0660)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0957 / CH0770
    (SB0195)
State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 770Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0968Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and SignageDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1143Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017Delegate LiermanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1170Education - College and Career Readiness Assessment - English Learner Student ExceptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1268Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)Delegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1351
    (SB0458)
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language CoursesDelegate RoseIn the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1381 / CH0608
    (SB0866 / CH0609)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Economic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1502Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in MarylandDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0088 / CH0496General Provisions - State Designations - Great SealSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0193Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0385 / CH0516
    (HB0482 / CH0515)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0458
    (HB1351)
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language CoursesSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0660
    (HB0808)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB1150Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and GuardiansSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.