Language

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0193 / CH0374
    (SB0043 / CH0373)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0490
    (SB0163 / CH0441)
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and CertificationDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0493
    (SB0638)
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading InstructionDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0503State Department of Education - Translation Grant Program - EstablishedDelegate WilkinsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0557Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of FundDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0562
    (SB0530)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0642Education - Dual Language Immersion Program - AuthorizationDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1087 / CH0338
    (SB0758 / CH0339)
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - LicensureDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1154Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Bilingual Certification and InstructionDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1300
    (SB0664)
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language CoursesDelegate RoseIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1386 / CH0032Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone NumberDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0029 / CH0733State Government - Websites - Language AccessSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 733Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0043 / CH0373
    (HB0193 / CH0374)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0163 / CH0441
    (HB0490)
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and CertificationSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0530
    (HB0562)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator MiddletonIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0638
    (HB0493)
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading InstructionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0664
    (HB1300)
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language CoursesSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0758 / CH0339
    (HB1087 / CH0338)
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - LicensureSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.