Laws and Ordinances

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0194
    (SB0270)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0252State Development Plan - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0315Residential Leases - Rent Stabilization and Just Cause EvictionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0402
    (SB0320)
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic CannabinoidsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0409 / CH0521
    (SB0443)
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0421Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0504
    (SB0370 / CH0463)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0587 / CH0122Electric Companies - Service Quality and Reliability Standards - Vegetation ManagementDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0768Food Service Facilities - Industrially Produced Trans Fat - ProhibitionDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0770
    (SB0742 / CH0312)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CityDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0820
    (SB0893)
Municipal Property Taxes - Annual Budget Ordinance and Special RatesDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1044
    (SB0584)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1111Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 401-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic MattersEnvironmental Matters
Economic Matters
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1285Prince George's County - Public School Construction Fee and Fund - Authority to Establish and Administer PG 402-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1432 / CH0684Prince George's County - Public Safety Surcharge PG 421-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1507 / CH0690St. Mary's County - Property MaintenanceSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1514 / CH0421Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1527Anne Arundel County - Human Relations - Violations of County Discrimination LawsDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHuman Relations (D5)
SB0117Crimes - Sale of Drug Paraphernalia to a Minor - Local Law Authorizing Business License Revocation for a Second or Subsequent ViolationSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0270
    (HB0194)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0316
    (HB0432)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0320
    (HB0402)
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic CannabinoidsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0370 / CH0463
    (HB0504)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0443
    (HB0409 / CH0521)
Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CyclesSenator DysonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0583Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0584
    (HB1044)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0671 / CH0520Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0742 / CH0312
    (HB0770)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CitySenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0893
    (HB0820)
Municipal Property Taxes - Annual Budget Ordinance and Special RatesSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.